No. 03-10451 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | May 20, 2004 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (02-41688) |
Decision Date: | February 18, 2004 |
Rule 12.4 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 11 2004 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 21, 2004) |
May 25 2004 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Jun 2 2004 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 17, 2004. |
Jun 21 2004 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Roland Edmund Dahlin II. | Federal Public Defender | (713) 718-4600 |
Counsel of Record | 440 Louisiana, Suite 310 | |
P.O. Box 61508 | ||
Houston, TX 77208-1508 | ||
Party name: Encarnacion Lujano-Perez | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Theodore B. Olson | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
United States Department of Justice | ||
950 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States |