~~Date~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 28 2002 | Petition for writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in |
| forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 27, 2002) |
Oct 10 2002 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 1, 2002 |
Oct 18 2002 | Response requested. |
Oct 21 2002 | Waiver of right of respondents David R. McKune, Warden, et al. to |
| respond filed. |
Oct 25 2002 | Brief of respondents David R. McKune, Warden, et al. in opposition |
| filed. |
Nov 7 2002 | REDISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 27, 2002 |
Dec 2 2002 | Petition DENIED. |
| ******************************************************** |
| |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | | |
Stephen W. Kessler | 3360 S.W. Harrison | 7852665922 |
| Topeka, KS 66611 | |
Party name: Noble Leroy Johnson |
| | |
Attorneys for Respondent: | | |
Jared S. Maag | Office of the Attorney General | 7852962215 |
| 120 SW 10th Street, 2nd Floor | |
| Topeka, KS 66612-1597 | |
Party name: David R. McKune, Warden, et al. |
| | |
| | |