No. 01-5309 | Status: | DECIDED |
Title: | Shawn Talbert Jetter, Petitioner | |
v. | ||
Texas | ||
Docketed: | Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Texas, Eighth District |
July 16, 2001 | (08-98-00307-CR) |
~~Date~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 16 2001 | Petition for writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in |
forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 15, 2001) | |
Aug 30 2001 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 24, 2001 |
Oct 1 2001 | Petition DENIED. |
******************************************************** | |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Shawn Talbert Jetter | #854583, Hughes Unit-Unit #042 | |
Rt. 2, Box 4400 | ||
Gatesville, TX 76597 | ||
Party name: Shawn T. Jetter | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
John Cornyn | Capitol Station | 5124632191 |
P.O. Box 12548 | ||
Austin, TX 78711-2548 | ||
Party name: Texas | ||