~~Date~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 10 2001 | Petition for writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in |
| forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 9, 2001) |
Jun 21 2001 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 24, 2001 |
Oct 1 2001 | The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is |
| denied, and the petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. |
| See Rule 39.8. As the petitioner has repeatedly abused this |
| Court's process, the Clerk is directed not to accept any further |
| petitions in noncriminal matters from petitioner unless the |
| docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) is paid and the petition is |
| submitted in compliance with Rule 33.1. See Martin v. District of |
| Columbia Court of Appeals, 506 U.S. 1 (1992) (per curiam). Justice |
| Stevens dissents. See id., at 4, and cases cited therein. |
| ******************************************************** |
| |